EP1259030 - System and method for predicting network performance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gateway, Inc. 610 Gateway Drive North Sioux City South Dakota 57049 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Gateway, Inc. 610 Gateway Drive North Sioux City, South Dakota 57049 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Glen J. 3034 Pierce Street Sioux City, IA 51104 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02394045.5 | 26.04.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | US20010861273 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: US 861273 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259030 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1259030 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04Q3/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
H04L41/147 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0083 (EP,US);
H04L41/5009 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/47] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/36] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Vorhersage der Netzwerkleistung | [2002/47] | English: | System and method for predicting network performance | [2002/47] | French: | Système et méthode pour prévoir la performance de réseau | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 12.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 10.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9624210 (CABLETRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,10,13 * abstract * * claims 1,8,13,14 * * page 1, lines 6-25 * * page 4, lines 18-24 * * page 6, lines 1-12 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 17 * [A] 2-4,6,8,9,11,12,14,15; | [X]US5951644 (CREEMER DAVID Z [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,5,6 * * figures 2,5 * * column 2, lines 28-62 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 5 * * column 8, lines 20-53 *; | [A]WO0106415 (NETPREDICT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 20,22 * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 3 * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 5 ** page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 8 *; | [XA]WO0117169 (ANDERSEN CONSULTING LLP [US]) [X] 1,5,7,10,13 * abstract * * page 3, lines 1-14 * * page 30, lines 6-15 * * page 92, line 1 - page 94, line 25 * * page 133, line 10 - page 135, line L * * claims 1,6,11 * [A] 2-4,6,8,9,11,12,14,15; | [A] - MEGGERS J, "Adaptive admission control and scheduling for wireless packet communication", NETWORKS, 1999. (ICON '99) PROCEEDINGS. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (19990928), pages 178 - 185, XP010354962 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * |