Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315394

EP1315394 - Short-distance wireless connections in a telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TeliaSonera Finland Oyj
Teollisuuskatu 15
00510 Helsinki / FI
[2004/10]
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
Sonera Oyj
Teollisuuskatu 15, P.O. Box 106
00510 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Korhonen, Jouni
Mutkatie 2A 4
11100 Riihimäki / FI
02 / Keisala, Ilkka
Pyörrekuja 4 F 77
01600 Vantaa / FI
03 / Väänänen, Kai
Lakeijankuja 3C
02940 Espoo / FI
 [2004/36]
Former [2003/22]01 / Korhonen, Jouni
Mutkatie 2A 4
11100 Riihimäki / FI
02 / Keisala, Iikka
Pyörrekuja 4 F 77
01600 Vantaa / FI
03 / Väänänen, Kai
Lakeijankuja 3C
02940 Espoo / FI
Representative(s)Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi , et al
Papula Oy
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Simmelvuo, Markku , et al
Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date02396173.320.11.2002
[2003/22]
Priority number, dateFI2001000228322.11.2001         Original published format: FI 20012283
[2003/22]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1315394
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1315394
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315394
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04L12/56, H04L12/28
[2003/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/22]
TitleGerman:Drahtlose Verbindungen kurzer Reichweite in einem Telekommunikationsnetz[2003/22]
English:Short-distance wireless connections in a telecommunication network[2003/22]
French:Connexions sans fil à courte distance dans un réseau de télécommunication[2004/36]
Former [2003/22]Connexions sans fil a courte distance dans un réseau de télécommunication
Examination procedure12.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/07]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2004Fee for grant paid
02.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
EE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
[2008/23]
Former [2008/04]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
EE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
Former [2007/38]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
EE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2007/11]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
EE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/52]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/22]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/15]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
CZ12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/01]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
SK12.01.2005
Former [2005/51]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
BG12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
Former [2005/46]BG12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
Former [2005/30]BG12.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1146692  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [1116] , [0018] , [0020] , [0043] , [0044] , [0047] , [0048] *;
 [Y]WO0069186  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 11, lines 16-35 - page 12, lines 1-7,17-21 *;
 [A]WO0056105  (SONERA SMARTTRUST OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] *;
 [Y]EP1130933  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 16-22 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0016] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043] , [0049] , [0051] , [0074] , [0076] , [0078] , [0099] *;
 [Y]WO0158113  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 16-22 * page 2, line 7 - line 27 * * page 4, line 10 - line 18 * * page 9, line 13 - line 18 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 4 *;
 [A]WO0165821  (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 16-22 * abstract *
 [Y]  - "SPECIFICATION OF THE BLUETOOTH SYSTEM", ., (19991201), XP002175286 [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [14.1] , [14.2] *
 [A]  - THE BLUETOOTH FORUM, "Generic Access Profile", ., (20010222), XP002175814 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *