blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1340567

EP1340567 - Method of removing casting defects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Fernihough, John
Sonnenbergstr. 14
5408 Ennetbaden / CH
02 / Hoebel, Matthias Dr.
Dorfstr. 82
5210 Windisch / CH
03 / Konter, Maxim Dr.
Sommerweg 13
5313 Klingnau / CH
 [2003/36]
Application number, filing date02405142.727.02.2002
[2003/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1340567
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2002
ClassificationIPC:B22D19/10, B22D27/04, B23P6/04, F01D5/00, C30B13/00
[2003/36]
CPC:
F01D5/005 (EP,US); B22D19/10 (EP,US); B22D27/045 (EP,US);
B23K31/02 (EP,US); B23P6/007 (EP,US); C30B11/00 (EP,US);
C30B13/00 (EP,US); C30B29/52 (EP,US); C30B33/00 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US); F05D2300/606 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Entfernen von Gussfehlern[2003/36]
English:Method of removing casting defects[2003/36]
French:Procédé pour éliminer des défauts de coulée[2003/36]
Examination procedure12.02.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS59152029  ;
 [A]JPS60167723  ;
 [A]US4705203  (MCCOMAS CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4878953  (SALTZMAN GILBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-6 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 22 *;
 [A]US5193272  (WORTMANN JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 10 *;
 [A]US5701669  (MEIER REINHOLD [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 20 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841226), vol. 008, no. 284, Database accession no. (M - 348), & JP59152029 A 19840830 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860108), vol. 010, no. 002, Database accession no. (M - 444), & JP60167723 A 19850831 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.