blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1251238

EP1251238 - Percussion rock drill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.12.2006  [2006/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Wisser, Erich
Bochstrasse 3
6900 Bregenz / AT
02 / John, Marcel
Schwarzackerstrasse 64
8887 Mels / CH
03 / Sander, Bernhard
Carinagasse 11
6800 Feldkirch / AT
04 / Schad, Hanspeter
Wiesenstrasse 5
9472 Grabs / CH
05 / Surberg, Cord-Henrik
Letzestrasse 27
6800 Feldkirch / AT
06 / Coffin, Charles
Churfürstenstrasse 15
7000 Chur / CH
07 / Vedder, Joachim
Montfortstrasse 8a
88138 Hergensweiler / DE
08 / Lins, Reinhard
Gonzenstrasse 12
9475 Sevelen / CH
 [2005/31]
Former [2002/43]01 / Wisser, Erich
Bochstrasse 3
6900 Bregenz / AT
02 / John, Marcel
Schwarzackerstrasse 64
8887 Mels / CH
03 / Sander, Bernhard
Carinagasse 11
6800 Feldkirch / AT
04 / Schad, Hanspeter
Wiesenstrasse 5
9472 Grabs / CH
05 / Surberg, Cord-Henrik
Letzestrasse 27
6800 Feldkirch / AT
06 / Coffin, Charles
Churf-rstenstrasse 15
7000 Chur / CH
07 / Vedder, Joachim
Montfortstrasse 8a
88138 Hergensweiler / DE
08 / Lins, Reinhard
Gonzenstrasse 12
9475 Sevelen / CH
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland, et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]Wildi, Roland, et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date02405273.008.04.2002
[2002/43]
Priority number, dateDE2001101956221.04.2001         Original published format: DE 10119562
[2002/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1251238
Date:23.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1251238
Date:04.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:E21B10/44
[2002/43]
CPC:
B28D1/146 (EP,US); B23B51/0045 (EP,US); E21B10/445 (EP,US);
E21D21/0053 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [2003/29]
Former [2002/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schlagbohrwerkzeug für Gestein[2002/43]
English:Percussion rock drill[2002/43]
French:Marteau à percussion pour roches[2002/43]
Examination procedure23.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
27.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2005Fee for grant paid
07.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09183104  ;
 [A]DE3102075  (CONDOR IM UND EXPORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4867249  (WATKINS JR REX A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-13 *;
 [A]DE4020242  (KAISER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9424404  (CUTINCOAL PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]GB2350315  (COLLINS JOHN FRANCIS [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09183104 A 19970715 (KANEFUSA KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.