blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1302236

EP1302236 - Pipe segment with a feeding port for an additiv [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sulzer Chemtech AG
Hegifeldstrasse 10
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2003/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Fleischli, Markus
Reismühlestrasse 13/11
8409 Winterhur / CH
02 / Mathys, Peter
Industriestrasse 43
8212 Neuhausen / CH
03 / Breiter, Albert
Eichenweg 7
8408 Winterhur / CH
 [2003/16]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Former [2003/16]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0067 Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date02405807.517.09.2002
[2003/16]
Priority number, dateEP2001081101516.10.2001         Original published format: EP 01811015
[2003/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1302236
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1302236
Date:14.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:B01F5/06, B01F5/04
[2003/16]
CPC:
B01F25/3141 (EP); B01F25/4316 (EP,US); B01F25/4315 (EP);
B01F25/431974 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/16]
TitleGerman:Rohrstück mit einer Einspeisestelle für ein Additiv[2003/16]
English:Pipe segment with a feeding port for an additiv[2003/16]
French:Segment de tuyau avec un post de alimentation pour un additif[2003/16]
Examination procedure18.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2006Fee for grant paid
05.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.02.2007
CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
TR14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
AT17.09.2007
LU17.09.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/38]CY14.02.2007
CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
AT17.09.2007
LU17.09.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2009/33]CY14.02.2007
CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
AT17.09.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2009/10]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
EE14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
AT17.09.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/50]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
AT17.09.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/40]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
BE30.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/22]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
MC30.09.2007
Former [2008/21]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
GR15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2008/02]CZ14.02.2007
DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/51]DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SK14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/48]DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
IE14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
PT16.07.2007
Former [2007/46]DK14.02.2007
FI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
Former [2007/39]FI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
ES25.05.2007
Former [2007/38]FI14.02.2007
SE14.05.2007
BG15.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4758098  (MEYER HANS [CH]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, line 28 - line 52 * * column 2, line 48 - line 50 * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 * * column 3, line 32 - line 35; figures 1,2A,4 * [A] 8;
 [YDA]US5839828  (GLANVILLE ROBERT W [US]) [YD] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, line 21 - line 41 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 21 - line 33 * * column 3, line 52 - line 59; figures 1-3,7,10 * [A] 8;
 [PX]EP1153650  (SULZER CHEMTECH AG [CH]) [PX] 1,2,4-7 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 17 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, line 15 - line 32 ** column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 6; figures 1,9,12; claims 1,8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.