blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1298776

EP1298776 - Rotary actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MPS Micro Precision Systems AG
Eckweg 8
2504 Biel/Bienne / CH
[2003/36]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
myonic AG
Eckweg 8
2504 Biel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Bourquard, Claude
Jerisbergmühle
3208 Gurbrü / CH
02 / Jauvtis, Louis
30 Webb Street
Lexington, Mass. 02420 / US
 [2003/14]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date02405813.324.09.2002
[2003/14]
Priority number, dateCH2001000180301.10.2001         Original published format: CH 18032001
[2003/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1298776
Date:02.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:H02K26/00, H01F7/14
[2003/14]
CPC:
H01F7/14 (EP); H01F7/121 (EP); H02K26/00 (EP);
H02K33/16 (EP); H01F7/122 (EP); H01F7/1615 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/14]
TitleGerman:Drehsteller[2003/14]
English:Rotary actuator[2003/14]
French:Actuateur rotatif[2003/14]
Examination procedure03.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
21.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
09.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4227164  (KITAHARA HARUO) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5,6;
 [X]US5469291  (PLESKO GEORGE A [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-17 *;
 [Y]US5931142  (GERLING DIETER [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * column 6, line 1 - column 6, line 4 ** column 7, line 7 - column 7, line 31; figure 3 *;
 [X]EP1009091  (MINEBCA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.