Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317892

EP1317892 - Folding table [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huber und Steiger GmbH
Hofstrasse 1
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Huber und Steiger Gmbh
Hofstrasse 1
8032 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Huber, Luzius
Forchstrasse 106
8032 Zürich / CH
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Walser, Peter
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Walser, Peter
c/o Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 524
8029 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date02406052.703.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateCH2001000221104.12.2001         Original published format: CH 22112001
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317892
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47B1/03, A47B13/08
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Falttisch[2003/24]
English:Folding table[2003/24]
French:Table pliante[2003/24]
Examination procedure01.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
28.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
12.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB156430  (ARTHUR NORMAN, et al) [X] 1,7,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8,10;
 [A]DE528180  (LANGENOELSER AUSZIEHTISCH U MO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1232788  (LATIERE ANDRE) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *