Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1428982

EP1428982 - A method of depositing a local MCrAIY-coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Alstom Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Khan, Abdus Suttar
Limmatauweg 2
5408 Ennetbaden / CH
02 / Duda, Thomas
Simonweg 3
5415 Nussbaumen / CH
 [2004/25]
Application number, filing date02406066.706.12.2002
[2004/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1428982
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1428982
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/28, C23C30/00, C25D5/02
[2004/25]
Designated contracting statesDE [2005/10]
Former [2004/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur selektiven Abscheidung einer MCrAlY-Beschichtung[2004/25]
English:A method of depositing a local MCrAIY-coating[2004/25]
French:Méthode pour déposer localement un revêtement de type MCrAlY[2004/25]
Examination procedure12.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
20.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2008Fee for grant paid
29.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5824205  (FOSTER JOHN [GB]) [XD] 1-7 * column 1, lines 40-42 * * column 2, lines 49-54 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 16 *;
 [XD]US5833829  (FOSTER JOHN [GB]) [XD] 1-7 * column 1, lines 40-42 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 21 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 26 *;
 [X]GB2167446  (BAJ LTD, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 18-20,47-65 * * page 2, lines 24-80 *;
 [X]US2002132132  (BOSE SUDHANGSHU [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 17 - paragraph 20 *;
 [X]US5837385  (SCHAEFFER JON C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 41-55 * * column 4, lines 6-8 * * column 5, lines 5-7 *;
 [A]US5702574  (FOSTER JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 13 * * column 6, lines 33-67 *