Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1226997

EP1226997 - Trolleybus power supply system based upon a trolley with traverse rods and a aerial single line with alternating poles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Natali, Gian Luca, Dr.
Via Mediana, 89 (già 101) 00040 Rocca Priora
Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
Natali, Gian Luca
Via Levanzo, 23
00133 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/31]
Application number, filing date02425020.122.01.2002
[2002/31]
Priority number, dateIT2001RM0003625.01.2001         Original published format: IT RM010036
IT2001RM0039705.07.2001         Original published format: IT RM010397
IT2001RM0039805.07.2001         Original published format: IT RM010398
[2002/31]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1226997
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1226997
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60M1/13, B60L5/42
[2002/31]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/23]
Former [2002/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stromversorgungssystem für ein Trolleybus basiert auf einen Trolley mit queren Stromabnehmer und einen einzigen Draht mit wechselnder Polarität[2002/31]
English:Trolleybus power supply system based upon a trolley with traverse rods and a aerial single line with alternating poles[2002/31]
French:Système d'alimentation électrique pour un trolleybus basée sur les collecteurs traversés et sur une seule ligne aérienne avec les deux pôles alternés[2002/31]
Examination procedure26.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
16.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2277694  (TREGIE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [A]DE9116017U  (MÜLLER) [A] 1 * the whole document *