Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260783

EP1260783 - Chamber locking safety device for light firearms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FABBRICA D'ARMI P.BERETTA S.p.A.
18, Via P. Beretta
25063 Gardone V.T. (Brescia) / IT
[2008/47]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
FABBRICA D'ARMI P.BERETTA S.p.A.
10, Via P. Beretta
25063 Gardone V.T. (Brescia) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gussalli Beretta, Ugo
6, Via Tosio
25121 Brescia / IT
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Vittorangeli, Lucia
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/24]Vittorangeli, Lucia
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2003/48]Crippa, Paolo Ernesto
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Piazzale Arnaldo, 2
25121 Brescia / IT
Former [2002/48]Manzoni, Alessandro
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
25121 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date02425277.703.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateIT2001BS0003618.05.2001         Original published format: IT BS20010036
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260783
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260783
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F41A17/44
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Sicherung des Patronenlagers einer Schusswaffe[2002/48]
English:Chamber locking safety device for light firearms[2002/48]
French:Dispositif de condamnation de la chambre du canon d'une arme à feu légère[2002/48]
Examination procedure05.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
14.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2008Fee for grant paid
30.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.11.2008
CY19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
GB03.05.2009
IE03.05.2009
LU03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
GB03.05.2009
IE03.05.2009
LU03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/47]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
GR20.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
GB03.05.2009
IE03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/25]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
GB03.05.2009
IE03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/23]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
IE03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/21]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
IE03.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/08]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/04]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2009/38]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
SE19.02.2009
ES01.03.2009
PT20.04.2009
Former [2009/34]AT19.11.2008
DK19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT19.11.2008
FI19.11.2008
NL19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT19.11.2008
ES01.03.2009
Former [2009/20]ES01.03.2009
Documents cited:Search[PX]FR2808081  (RONIS SA [FR]) [PX] 1-3 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, column 2; figure - *;
 [X]US5950344  (ROSS LARRY [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 19; figure - *;
 [A]DE29920918U  (BLASER HORST JAGDWAFFEN [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 7 *;
 [A]US4908971  (CHANEY JAMES C [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 41 *