blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1276086

EP1276086 - System for monitoring and controlling the average speed of vehicles in transit, and surveying of traffic on roads and motorways [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Donnini, Romolo
Via del Valico, 16 50063 Ponte Agli Stolli, Figline Valdarno
Firenze / IT
For all designated states
Polese, Giovanni
Via Nuova, 19 33070 S. Giovanni, Polcenigo
Pordenone / IT
For all designated states
Righi, Andrea
Via Grevigiana, 33 50063 Ponte Agli Stolli, Figline Valdarno
Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
Donnini, Romolo
Via del Valico, 16
50063 Ponte Agli Stolli, Figline Valdarno, Firenze / IT
For all designated states
Polese, Giovanni
Via Nuova, 19
33070 S. Giovanni, Polcenigo, Pordenone / IT
For all designated states
Righi, Andrea
Via Grevigiana, 33
50063 Ponte Agli Stolli, Figline Valdarno, Firenze / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/03]
Representative(s)Mannucci, Michele, et al
Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l.
Via della Scala 4
50123 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]Mannucci, Michele, et al
Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.R.L, Via della Scala 4
50123 Firenze / IT
Application number, filing date02425438.502.07.2002
[2003/03]
Priority number, dateIT2001FI0013010.07.2001         Original published format: IT FI20010130
[2003/03]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1276086
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1276086
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:G08G1/052, G08G1/054, G08G1/017, G08G1/04
[2003/03]
CPC:
G08G1/0175 (EP); G08G1/054 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/03]
TitleGerman:System zur Überwachung und Steuerung der Durchschnittsgeschwindigkeit von sich bewegenden Fahrzeugen und zur Untersuchung des Verkehrs auf Strassen und Autobahnen[2003/03]
English:System for monitoring and controlling the average speed of vehicles in transit, and surveying of traffic on roads and motorways[2003/03]
French:Système de surveillance et commande de la vitesse moyenne des véhicules en passage, et de l'inspection du traffic sur des routes et des autoroutes[2004/21]
Former [2003/03]Système de surveillance and commande de la vitesse moyenne des véhicules en passage, et de l'inspection du traffic sur des routes et des autoroutes
Examination procedure10.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2004Fee for grant paid
25.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
EE22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
TR22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
PT22.05.2005
CY02.07.2005
LU02.07.2005
IE04.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
[2008/04]
Former [2007/26]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
EE22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
TR22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
CY02.07.2005
LU02.07.2005
IE04.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2007/20]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
EE22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
TR22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
CY02.07.2005
IE04.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2007/11]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
EE22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
TR22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
SE22.03.2005
IE04.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/52]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
TR22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
IE04.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/28]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
IE04.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/25]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
IE04.07.2005
Former [2006/14]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
NL22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
DK22.03.2005
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT22.12.2004
BE22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/48]AT22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
SK22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
CZ22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT22.12.2004
BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/30]BG22.12.2004
CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
GR22.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH22.12.2004
FI22.12.2004
LI22.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3327706  (RAPP EGBERT DIPL ING) [A] 1-4,6,9 * abstract * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 29; figures 1-4 * * page 9, line 19 - line 30 *;
 [XAY]EP0494815  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 45 * * figure 7 * [A] 6,8 [Y] 5;
 [A]DE4330349  (HAAR JOCHEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,6,9 * abstract ** column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 2; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5878367  (LEE GREGORY REID [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 37; figure 1 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 5; figure 2B *;
 [A]EP0978811  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 19 - line 36 * * column 4, line 38 - column 8, line 51; figures 1,2 *;
 [XAY]WO0135372  (C R A F T S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9 * the whole document * [A] 6,8 [Y] 5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.