Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255008

EP1255008 - Adjustable cylinder with vacant/engaged notice [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Litto
Canadalaan 73
8620 Nieuwpoort / BE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Clapdorp, Fernand
Brouwerijstraat 65
8790 Waregem / BE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Hollidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date02447083.306.05.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateBE2001000031504.05.2001         Original published format: BE 200100315
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255008
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255008
Date:26.02.2003
[2003/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:E05B41/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/46]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verstellbarer Zylinder mit Offen/Geschlossen-Anzeige[2002/45]
English:Adjustable cylinder with vacant/engaged notice[2002/45]
French:Cylindre réglable avec indicateur de déverrouillage ou verrouillage[2002/45]
Examination procedure27.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
18.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.10.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.10.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.10.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXY]CH560307  (BURRI MAX METALLGARNITUR GMBH) [DX] 1,3,10 * the whole document * [Y] 9;
 [YA]DE29707200U  (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 7, line 8 - line 10; figures 1-3 * [A] 1;
 [A]DE1659790  (ERBACHER & KOLB) [A] 1,3,8-10 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1,16-18 *;
 [A]DE6607323U  (ZEISS IKON AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,6,8,10 * page 5, lines 5-18; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]FR1481665  (BUDERUS EISENWERK) [A] 1 * the whole document *