Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1398837

EP1398837 - Photovoltaic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Change - applicantpublished on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMEC
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
[2009/33]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM ( IMEC)
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Bilyalov, Renat
Perklaan 27
3390 Tielt-Winge / BE
02 / Ulyashin, Alexander
Lützowstrasse 26
58085 Hagen / DE
03 / Poortmans, Jef
Overwinningsstraat 51
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
04 / Fahrner, Wolfgang
Grenzweg 23
58097 Hagen / DE
 [2004/12]
Representative(s)Van Malderen, Joëlle , et al
pronovem - Office Van Malderen
Avenue Josse Goffin 158
1082 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]Van Malderen, Joelle , et al
Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1
1083 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date02447171.609.09.2002
[2004/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1398837
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/028, H01L31/072, H01L31/075
[2004/12]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/50]
Former [2004/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Photovoltaische Vorrichtung[2004/12]
English:Photovoltaic device[2004/12]
French:Dispositif photovoltaique[2004/12]
Examination procedure18.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
17.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.10.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
29.10.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.10.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH03235371  ;
 [A]JPH05283723  ;
 [X]  - BILYALOV R ET AL, "Porous silicon as an intermediate layer for thin-film solar cell", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200101), vol. 65, no. 1-4, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 477 - 485, XP004217155 [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * page 477 - page 478; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(00)00130-6
 [X]  - JIN S ET AL, "Transmission electron microscopy investigation of the crystallographic quality of silicon films grown epitaxially on porous silicon", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (2000), vol. 212, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 119 - 127, XP004196213 [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(00)00226-8
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920114), vol. 016, no. 014, Database accession no. (E - 1154), & JP03235371 A 19911021 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,12 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHANG C C ET AL, "STUDY AND FABRICATION OF PIN PHOTODIODE BY USING ZNSE/PS/SI STRUCTURE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (20000101), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 50 - 54, XP000947222 [X] 1,3-9,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.817566
 [X]  - RUBINO A ET AL, "Amorphous/porous heterojunction on thin microcrystalline silicon", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200005), vol. 266-269, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 1044 - 1048, XP004198698 [X] 1-10,12 * page 1045; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(99)00903-5
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940203), vol. 018, no. 066, Database accession no. (E - 1501), & JP05283723 A 19931029 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - YEROKHOV V Y ET AL, "Porous silicon in solar cell structures: a review of achievements and modern directions of further use", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE ENERGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIERS SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199912), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1364-0321, pages 291 - 322, XP004268410 [A] 1-9,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1364-0321(99)00005-2
 [A]  - PALSULE C ET AL, "Electrical and optical characterization of crystalline silicon/porous silicon heterojunctions", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970701), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 261 - 269, XP004122889

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(97)00004-4