Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241400

EP1241400 - Vehicle headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zizala Lichtsysteme GmbH
Scheibbser Strasse 17
3250 Wieselburg / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Zizala Lichtsysteme GmbH
Scheibbser Strasse 17
A-3250 Wieselburg / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Aichinger, Michael
In der Spitz 12
3620 Spitz a.d. Donau / AT
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Matschnig, Franz
Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1071 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing.
Siebensterngasse 54
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date02450020.931.01.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateAT2001000039613.03.2001         Original published format: AT 3962001
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241400
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241400
Date:01.06.2005
[2005/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241400
Date:14.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/12, F21V13/04
[2006/46]
Former International [2002/38]F21S8/12, F21V13/04, // F21W101:10
Designated contracting statesDE [2006/08]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugscheinwerfer[2002/38]
English:Vehicle headlamp[2002/38]
French:Projecteur pour véhicule[2002/38]
Examination procedure15.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
02.12.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.04.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2007Fee for grant paid
26.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE19906580  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 24 * * figure 4 * [A] 13;
 [YA]EP1070912  (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 12 - line 39 * * column 8, line 1 - line 17 * * column 10, line 52 - line 57 * * figures 1A,1B,4A * [A] 2,5,10-12,14-18;
 [A]DE3340462  (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1,2,6,8 *;
 [A]DE305151  (ALLGEMEINE ELEKTRICITÄTS-GESELLSCHAFT IN BERLIN) [A] 1,5,10-12,14-18 * page 2, line 8 - line 32 * * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]US5440456  (BERTLING JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,10-12,14-18 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 18 - line 29 * * column 3, line 48 - line 51 * * figures 1-3,6 *