EP1256722 - Centrifugal pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCG UNITECH Aktiengesellschaft Steiermärker Strasse 49 4560 Kirchdorf/Krems / AT | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heim, Markus Ing., c/o Sidrag AG, Kundensupport Sihlbruggstrasse 146 6340 Baar / CH | 02 /
Gösweiner, Herbert Ing. Seebach 50 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Mag. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02450114.0 | 07.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | AT20010000759 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: AT 7592001 | [2002/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256722 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256722 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256722 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F04D13/0666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/39] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kreiselpumpe | [2002/46] | English: | Centrifugal pump | [2002/46] | French: | Pompe centrifugale | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 03.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.02.2007 | [2007/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4644202 (KROY RALPH E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19646617 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]US6034465 (MCKEE GARY F [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7 * the whole document * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 4 *; | [X]US6132186 (COOPER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7* the whole document * | by applicant | DE1613626 | DE2556631 | DE19617495 |