Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316761

EP1316761 - Air humidification device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2007
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merlin Technology GmbH
Hannesgrub 8
4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Reisinger, Johann
Röth 6
4925 Pramet / AT
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Helmut , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher
Postfach 411
4010 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date02450270.027.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateAT2001000186830.11.2001         Original published format: AT 18682001
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316761
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316761
Date:20.07.2005
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:F24F6/14
[2003/23]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/15]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Luftbefeuchtung[2003/23]
English:Air humidification device[2003/23]
French:Dispositif d'humidification de l'air[2003/23]
Examination procedure21.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/16]
23.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/16]
21.06.2006Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
22.11.2006Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.03.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
03.03.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.03.2006M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6257502  (HANISH BARRY N [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10007963  (HAUPTKORN HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 18; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0251196  (KIESEL VERA [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2163671  (LAMBAEK SOREN BJERRE) [A] 1 * the whole document *