Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1368768

EP1368768 - SECURE NETWORK ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ewise Systems Pty Ltd
Level 14, 132 Arthur Street North Sydney
New SOuth Wales 2060 / AU
[2014/19]
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
Ewise Systems Pty Ltd
Level 14, 132 Arthur Street
North Sydney, New SOuth Wales 2060 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / GRINBERG, Alexander
Level 14, 132 Arthur Street
North Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU
02 / KONTOROVICH, Michael
Level 14, 132 Arthur St
North Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU
03 / REYBURN, Colin
Level 14, 132 Arthur Street
North Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU
04 / CHAZAN, Mark
Level 14, 132 Arthur Street
North Sydney, New South Wales 2060 / AU
 [2003/50]
Representative(s)Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Former [2003/50]Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing.
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date02700012.414.02.2002
[2003/50]
WO2002AU00150
Priority number, dateAU2001002122515.02.2001         Original published format: AU 2122501
[2003/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02065352
Date:22.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1368768
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1368768
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search reportAU22.08.2002
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/41, G06F21/60, G06F21/62
[2013/48]
Former International [2003/50]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/50]
TitleGerman:SICHERER NETZWERKZUGANG[2003/50]
English:SECURE NETWORK ACCESS[2003/50]
French:ACCES AU RESEAU SECURISE[2003/50]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2003National basic fee paid 
15.09.2003Search fee paid 
15.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
15.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
17.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2013
24.10.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2014Fee for grant paid
26.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2010
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.05.2011Request for further processing filed
03.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.05.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
[2017/46]
Former [2015/46]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/12]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
NL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
GR08.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US5235642  (WOBBER EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13,17,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 22 * * column 4, line 15 - line 30 * * column 6, line 51 - line 62 * * column 8, line 31 - line 44 * * column 7, line 22 - line 23 *
International search[X]EP0717339  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]);
 [XP]US2001020228  (CANTU ARTHUR [US], et al);
 [XP]WO0195072  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]);
 [A]US6006333  (NIELSEN JAKOB [US]);
 [A]US6182229  (NIELSEN JAKOB [US])
 [X]  - GATOR E-WALLET (THE GATOR CORPORATION), (19991103), URL: www.Gator.com, XP008099531
by applicantUS5235642