Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1368768 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1368768



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 309
29.11.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
22.10.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
25.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
25.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
25.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
25.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.09.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
25.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
24.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
24.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.09.2013 Annex Search / examination 3
24.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
24.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 21
24.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
24.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
23.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
17.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.05.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
05.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
05.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 8
05.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
05.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
03.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
03.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 8
03.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
03.05.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 9
03.03.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.11.2010 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.05.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.05.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.10.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
25.07.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
12.07.2008 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.02.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.02.2004 Priority document Search / examination 25
10.02.2004 Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.09.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
26.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.08.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
29.08.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.08.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26