Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1368768


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.03.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
04.04.2014 (Expected) grant published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
29.03.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.03.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.11.2013 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
25.10.2013 Change - classification published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
25.10.2013 Change - classification published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
17.05.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.05.2011 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
16.05.2011 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
16.05.2011 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
04.05.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.03.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.11.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.05.2010 First examination report
11.05.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.02.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2009 Supplementary search report published on  26.08.2009  [2009/35]
21.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.02.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
16.04.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
21.02.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2003  [2003/50]
24.10.2003 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2003  [2003/50]
07.10.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication