Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1354502

EP1354502 - HIGH FREQUENCY PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD VIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FormFactor, Inc.
7005 Southfront Road
Livermore, CA 94551 / US
[2005/49]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
FORMFACTOR, INC.
2140 Research Drive
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HREISH, Emad, B.
6440 Stoneridge Mall Road, Apt. K218
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
02 / MILLER, Charles, A.
48881 Semillon Drive
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
 [2009/19]
Former [2004/13]01 / HREISH, Emad, B.
6440TONERIDGE Mall Road, Apt. K218
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
02 / MILLER, Charles, A.
48881 Semillon Drive
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
Former [2003/43]01 / HREISH, Emad, B.
1085 Murrieta Boulevard, No. 214
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
02 / MILLER, Charles, A.
48881 Semillon Drive
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2003/43]Käck, Jürgen
Kahler Käck Mollekopf Patentanwälte Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Application number, filing date02701987.615.01.2002
[2003/43]
WO2002US01212
Priority number, dateUS2001076135216.01.2001         Original published format: US 761352
[2003/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02058234
Date:25.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1354502
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002
[2003/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1354502
Date:14.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, H05K1/11, H03H7/01, H01P1/04
[2003/43]
Designated contracting statesDE [2004/21]
Former [2003/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHFREQUENZLEITERPLATTENKONTAKTLOCHER[2003/43]
English:HIGH FREQUENCY PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD VIA[2003/43]
French:TRAVERSEE DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME HAUTE FREQUENCE[2003/43]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2003National basic fee paid 
14.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2009Fee for grant paid
04.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH09321433  ;
 [AY]WO0051232  (FORMFACTOR INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-4,14-16,18,19,24-30;
 [XY]JP2000188478  ;
 [X]JPH11150371  ;
 [X]JPH0294693  ;
 [X]US4675788  (BREITLING WOLFRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]JP2000208887  ;
 [A]DE3937183  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,12,13,20,21,24,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH1154869
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, [X] 1,5-8,11-13,21,22 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,14-16,18,19,23-30
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, [X] 1,7-11,17,20-22 * abstract * [Y] 18,19,23
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, [X] 1,7,8,11,21 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900625), vol. 014, no. 292, Database accession no. (E - 0944), [X] 1,7,8,11,21 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, [X] 1,7-11,20,21 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] 1,5 * abstract *