Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1355823

EP1355823 - NON-MECHANICAL VALVES FOR FLUIDIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.12.2008  [2008/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Caliper Life Sciences, Inc.
605 Fairchild Drive
Mountain View, CA 94043-2234 / US
[2004/22]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
Caliper Life Sciences, Inc.
605 Fairchild Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
Caliper Life Science, Inc.
605 Fairchild Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
Caliper Technologies Corporation
605 Fairchild Drive
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PARCE, J., Wallace
754 Los Altos Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / CHOW, Andrea, W.
670 Cuesta Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2003/44]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02702072.624.01.2002
[2003/44]
WO2002US02023
Priority number, dateUS20010264788P29.01.2001         Original published format: US 264788 P
[2003/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02060754
Date:08.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1355823
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002
[2003/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.08.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:B65B1/04, B01L3/00, F15C1/04
[2004/45]
Former International [2003/44]B65B1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/44]
TitleGerman:NICHTMECHANISCHE VENTILE FÜR STRÖMUNGSSYSTEME[2003/44]
English:NON-MECHANICAL VALVES FOR FLUIDIC SYSTEMS[2003/44]
French:VANNES NON MECANIQUES POUR SYSTEMES FLUIDIQUES[2003/44]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2003National basic fee paid 
01.07.2003Search fee paid 
01.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/44]
31.10.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200706   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0816837  (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 4; figure 4a *;
 [X]US6033546  (RAMSEY J MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 6, line 21 - column 34, line 42; figures 10,31A-C *;
 [X]US6001231  (KOPF-SILL ANNE R [US]) [X] 1-33 * column 4, line 1 - column 17, line 41; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5869004  (PARCE JOHN WALLACE [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *;
 [A]  SEILER K ET AL, "ELECTROSMOTIC PUMPING AND VALVELESS CONTROL OF FLUID FLOW WITHIN A MANIFOLD OF CAPILLARIES ON A GLASS CHIP", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19941015), vol. 66, no. 20, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3485 - 3491, XP000478750 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00092a029
International search[A]US6039211
 [A]US4459267