EP1462264 - INK-JET LINE PRINTER AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD 17-22 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2009/06] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD 17-22 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANPEI, Koichi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Mitsuhiro, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
IWAISHI, Akira, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Shigeyoshi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
TATENO, Katsumi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02702777.0 | 07.03.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002JP02098 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074277 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462264 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462264 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/18, B41J2/01, B41J2/44 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B41J2/16588 (EP,US);
B41J2/14274 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
B41J2/165 (EP,US);
B41J2/16585 (EP,US);
B41J2/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/06] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHL-ZEILENDRUCKER UND IHN VERWENDENDE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/40] | English: | INK-JET LINE PRINTER AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE USING IT | [2004/40] | French: | IMPRIMANTE PAR LIGNE A JET D'ENCRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE L'UTILISANT | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/40] | IMPRIMANTE PAR LIGNE A JET D ENCRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATIO N D IMAGE L UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2004 | Translation filed | 23.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 21.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/35] | FR | 06.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002059559 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0026] - [0032] - [0059] - [0064]; figures 1-6,8,9; claims 1-6 * | International search | [A]JP2000218884 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2001105635 (CANON KK) | by applicant | JPH06219009 | JPH0781049 | JPH1120175 |