Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1380589

EP1380589 - PROTEIN PURIFICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEDA, Kozo, c/o Chugai Seiyaku K. K.
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
02 / OCHI, Norimichi, c/o Chugai Seiyaku K. K.
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
 [2004/03]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/03]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02703958.511.03.2002
[2004/03]
WO2002JP02248
Priority number, dateJP2001006711109.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001067111
[2004/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02072615
Date:19.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1380589
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002
[2004/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.09.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/30, C07K1/22, C07K16/00, C12P21/08, A61K39/395
[2004/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PROTEINREINIGUNG[2004/03]
English:PROTEIN PURIFICATION METHOD[2004/03]
French:METHODE DE PURIFICATION DE PROTEINES[2004/03]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2003Translation filed 
09.10.2003National basic fee paid 
09.10.2003Search fee paid 
09.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
21.10.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2008Observations by third parties
23.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2015Observations by third parties
05.10.2015Observations by third parties
23.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
17.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.05.2016Appeal received No.  T2326/16
26.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP10011215.0  / EP2336149
EP16170137.0  / EP3088412
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.02.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
22.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
18.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
21.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
21.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1020522  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-13,15,18-22 * page 35, line 13 - line 30 *;
 [X]EP0962467  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 19-22 * claim - *
 [X]  - LYDERSEN B K ET AL, "Acid precipitation of mammalian cell fermentation broth.", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES. UNITED STATES 30 NOV 1994, (19941130), vol. 745, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 222 - 231, XP009033271 [X] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb44375.x
 [X]  - SHINKURA H ET AL, "Safety and kinetic properties of a humanized antibody to human interleukin-6 receptor in healthy non-human primates", TOXICOLOGY, (19971019), vol. 122, no. 3, ISSN 0300-483X, pages 163 - 170, XP001069948 [X] 19-22 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-483X(97)00092-9
International search[X]EP0168506  ;
 [X]WO9207084  ;
 [X]WO9118919  ;
 [X]JPH1198997  ;
 [A]EP0089218
otherWO9522389
    - WALTER J. MOORE, PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, PRENTICE HALL INC., (1972), pages 423 - 425, 443, XP055218258