blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1370981 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1370981



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 293
19.09.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
06.06.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
06.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
06.06.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
06.06.2008 Means of redress Search / examination 2
03.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.03.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
17.03.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
17.03.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
14.03.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.03.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.03.2008 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
12.03.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
19.02.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
18.02.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
18.02.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
30.11.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.11.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
19.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
19.11.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.11.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.03.2006 Annex Search / examination 3
24.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
15.12.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
05.11.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
16.10.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.09.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.08.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.08.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.08.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.08.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.08.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.08.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.08.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.08.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.06.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.08.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.08.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.08.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.08.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.08.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
07.08.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
01.08.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 41
29.03.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.03.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 6
29.03.2002 Description International Searching Authority 16
29.03.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 17