blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1370981


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.09.2008 Refusal of application published on  29.10.2008  [2008/44]
04.06.2008 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
30.05.2008 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.01.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2007 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.12.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.01.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2003 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
31.10.2003 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
25.10.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
25.10.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
17.10.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
25.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication