blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1370981
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004209230Global Dossier 21.10.2004A1
Priority number Date
DE10103462 25.01.2001
DE10120574 26.04.2001
DE0200107 16.01.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1370981Global Dossier 17.12.2003A2
Priority number Date
DE10103462 25.01.2001
DE10120574 26.04.2001
DE0200107 16.01.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO02059778Global Dossier 16.10.2003A3
WO02059778 01.08.2002A2
Priority number Date
DE10103462 25.01.2001
DE10120574 26.04.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE10120574 29.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10103462 25.01.2001
DE10120574 26.04.2001