Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1370981

EP1370981 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPRESENTING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/51]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BEU, Andreas
Kirchplatz 8
85649 Hofolding / DE
02 / TRIEBFÜRST, Gunthard
Äussere Bayreuther Strasse 121
90409 Nürnberg / DE
 [2003/51]
Application number, filing date02704586.316.01.2002
[2003/51]
WO2002DE00107
Priority number, dateDE200110346225.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10103462
DE200112057426.04.2001         Original published format: DE 10120574
[2003/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02059778
Date:01.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1370981
Date:17.12.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002
[2003/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2003/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/51]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSDARSTELLUNG[2003/51]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPRESENTING INFORMATION[2003/51]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA REPRESENTATION D'INFORMATIONS[2003/51]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2003National basic fee paid 
02.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2008Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/44]
17.06.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]  - REKIMOTO J ET AL, "Augment-able reality: situated communication through physical and digital spaces", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PITTSBURGH, PA, USA 19-20 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981019), ISBN 0-8186-9074-7, pages 68 - 75, XP010312817 [X] 1-6,8-19,21-26 * page 69, column R - page 74, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1998.729531
 [X]  - REKIMOTO J ET AL, "THE WORLD THROUGH THE COMPUTER: COMPUTER AUGMENTED INTERACTION WITHREAL WORLD ENVIRONMENTS", UIST '95. 8TH ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY. PITTSBURGH, PA, NOV. 14 - 17, 1995, ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, NEW YOR, (19951114), ISBN 0-89791-709-X, pages 29 - 36, XP000634412 [X] 1,5,6,8,10-12,14,18,19,21,23-25 * page 30, column L - page 32, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/215585.215639
 [X]  - RAGHAVAN V ET AL, "Interactive evaluation of assembly sequences using augmented reality", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, JUNE 1999, IEEE, USA, vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 1042-296X, pages 435 - 449, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel5/70/16638/00768177.pdf?isNumber=16638&prod=IEEE%20JNL&arnumber=768177&arSt=435&ared=449&arAuthor=Raghavan%2C+V.%3B+Molineros%2C+J.%3B+Sharma%2C+R.%3B, (20030710), XP002247159 [X] 1,5-7,9,11,12,14,18-20,22,24,25 * page 436, column L - page 445, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/70.768177
 [X]  - FEINER S ET AL, "A touring machine: prototyping 3D mobile augmented reality systems for exploring the urban environment", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1997. DIGEST OF PAPERS., FIRST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA 13-14 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971013), ISBN 0-8186-8192-6, pages 74 - 81, XP010251545 [X] 1,5,9-12,14,18,22-25 * page 74, column L - page 76, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1997.629922
 [X]  - HOLLERER T ET AL, "Situated documentaries: embedding multimedia presentations in the real world", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1999. DIGEST OF PAPERS. THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 18-19 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991018), ISBN 0-7695-0428-0, pages 79 - 86, XP010360117 [X] 1,5,9-12,14,18,22-25 * page 81, column L - page 85, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1999.806664
 [A]  - STARNER T ET AL, "Visual contextual awareness in wearable computing", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PITTSBURGH, PA, USA 19-20 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981019), ISBN 0-8186-9074-7, pages 50 - 57, XP010312842 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1998.729529
 [A]  - GERSHMAN A V ET AL, "Situated computing: bridging the gap between intention and action", WEARABLE COMPUTERS, 1999. DIGEST OF PAPERS. THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 18-19 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991018), ISBN 0-7695-0428-0, pages 3 - 9, XP010360082 [A] 1-26 * page 7, column R - page 8, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1999.806635