blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1368997

EP1368997 - ELECTRICAL APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/50]ELECTRICAL APPARATUS AND METHOD
[2005/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS PLC
Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[2006/02]
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
SIEMENS PLC
Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MANSTON, Keith
62 Bluebell Lane Creekmore
Poole, Dorset BH17 7YU / GB
02 / COX, Paul
10 Tarn Drive Creekmoor
Poole, Dorset BH17 7DQ / GB
 [2003/50]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/50]Morgan, Marc
Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date02704902.211.03.2002
[2003/50]
WO2002GB00963
Priority number, dateGB2001000599210.03.2001         Original published format: GB 0105992
GB2001000866706.04.2001         Original published format: GB 0108667
[2003/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02074017
Date:19.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1368997
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1368997
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:H05B33/08
[2003/50]
CPC:
B61L5/1881 (EP,US); H05B45/44 (EP); H05B45/50 (EP,US);
B61L2207/02 (EP); Y02B20/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/50]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT UND DAZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN[2005/32]
English:ELECTRICAL APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING METHOD[2005/32]
French:APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT[2003/50]
Former [2003/50]ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT UND VERFAHREN
Former [2003/50]ELECTRICAL APPARATUS AND METHOD
Entry into regional phase05.09.2003National basic fee paid 
05.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
04.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2005Fee for grant paid
04.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200504   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2005
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
CY11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
FR11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/52]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
FR11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2008/38]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
FR31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2008/21]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/38]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/13]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/11]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/51]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/48]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/46]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE11.04.2006
Former [2006/43]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
Former [2006/42]CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
Former [2006/36]FI11.01.2006
Cited inInternational search[XA]FR2724749  (SOFRELA SA [FR]) [X] 1-8,11-15,17-23,25,26 * abstract * [A] 9,10,16;
 [X]WO9849872  (SIGNAL HOUSE LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 24-26 * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 6 * * abstract *;
 [XA]CA2225005  (ECOLUX INC [CA]) [X] 19,25 * abstract *[A] 1,11,15;
 [XA]US6118259  (BUCKS MARCEL J M [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,11-15,17-23,25,26 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 26; figures 1-3 * [A] 9,10,16;
 [XD]US6150771  (PERRY BRADFORD J [US]) [XD] 19,25 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.