19.12.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
30.08.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.06.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
23.06.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
23.06.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
22.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
31.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|