Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1360820 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1360820



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 314
28.07.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.08.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.05.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.02.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
28.11.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.11.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.11.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
14.10.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
18.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.08.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
06.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
15.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.05.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
08.05.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.01.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.01.2008 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.09.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.07.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
06.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.06.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.04.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.03.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.03.2007 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.03.2007 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
29.03.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
29.03.2007 Means of redress Search / examination 1
11.04.2005 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
10.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
10.03.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
29.10.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
08.07.2004 Description Search / examination 2
08.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
09.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
31.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
21.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
12.02.2003 Refund of fees (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2003 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.01.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.12.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
27.12.2002 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.09.2002 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
17.09.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
06.09.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
05.09.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.08.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.08.2002 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 33
29.03.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.03.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 6
29.03.2002 Description International Searching Authority 21
29.03.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 4