Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1427790

EP1427790 - EASY TO MANUFACTURE METH(ACRYLIC) ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.09.2009
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Schweiz AG
Tüffenwies 16-22
8064 Zürich / CH
[2004/25]
Inventor(s)01 / DE COOMAN, Ria
Rosengartenstrasse 71
CH-8037 Zürich / CH
02 / MEYER, Werner, R.
Binderstrasse 62
CH-8702 Zollikon / CH
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys , et al
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2007/44]Sika Patent Attorneys , et al
c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
Former [2004/25]Isler, Jörg
c/o Sika Technology AG, Tüffenwies 16 Postfach
8064 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date02707060.607.03.2002
[2004/25]
WO2002IB00865
Priority number, dateEP2001010534908.03.2001         Original published format: EP 01105349
[2004/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02070620
Date:12.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1427790
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1427790
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09J4/06, C09J175/16, C08F290/06
[2004/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEICHT ZU HERSTELLENDE METH(ACRYL)KLEBSTOFFE[2004/25]
English:EASY TO MANUFACTURE METH(ACRYLIC) ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS[2004/25]
French:COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES A BASE METHACRYLIQUE FACILES A FABRIQUER[2004/25]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2003National basic fee paid 
08.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/25]
22.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2008Fee for grant paid
03.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.07.2010  30.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Scott Bader Company Ltd.
Wollaston Wellingborough
Northamptonshire NN29 7RL / GB
Opponents representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP, et al
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 [2019/04]
Former [2010/34]
Opponent(s)01  21.07.2010   
Scott Bader Company Ltd.
Wollaston Wellingborough
Northamptonshire NN29 7RL / GB
Opponents representative
Lyons, June Margaret, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
26.08.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.03.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0144/16
18.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
17.10.2008Request for further processing filed
17.09.2007Request for further processing filed
17.09.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.10.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
TR21.10.2009
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
IE07.03.2010
LU07.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
[2015/21]
Former [2011/14]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
IE07.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2011/10]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
IE07.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2011/07]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
IE07.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2010/46]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
GR22.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
MC31.03.2010
Former [2010/35]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/29]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/22]FI21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/19]ES01.02.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US4439600  (MORAN JR JAMES P) [A] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * column 11, lines 38-42 *;
 [A]WO0077109  (LORD CORP) [A] 1-9,12,13 * example - *;
 [A]EP1013735  (THREE BOND CO LTD) [A] 1-10,13 * example -; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO0073397  (LORD CORP) [A] 1-6,9,11-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5710235  (ABBEY KIRK JOSEPH ET AL) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 51-54; claims 1,2,11 *;
 [A]WO9525760  (DSM NV) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5994464  (FUJII TATSUO ET AL) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4942201  (BRIGGS PAUL C ET AL) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5206288  (BRIGGS PAUL C ET AL) [A] 1 * claim 1 *