EP1384192 - SYSTEM FOR AND METHOD OF PERFORMING EVALUATION TECHNIQUES ON A LOG OR ROUND TIMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Control of Michigan Technological University 1400 Townsend Drive Houghton Michigan 49931 / US | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY OF AGRICULTURE United States Department of Agriculture, Office of the General Counsel, South Bldg., Room 2321, 12th Street & Independence Avenue, S.W. Washington, DC 20250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Board of Control of Michigan Technological University 1400 Townsend Drive Houghton, Michigan 49931 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY OF AGRICULTURE United States Department of Agriculture, Office of the General Counsel, South Bldg., Room 2321, 12th Street & Independence Avenue, S.W. Washington, DC 20250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiping 4701 Sheboygan Avenue, 208 Madison, WI 53705 / US | 02 /
ROSS, Robert, J. 3117 Silverton Trail Madison, WI 53719 / US | 03 /
MATTSON, James, A. 305 N. Florida Avenue Laurium, MI 49913 / US | 04 /
ERICKSON, John 2 Windhaven Circle Madison, WI 53717 / US | 05 /
FORSMAN, John, W. 23768 Forsman Road Hancock, MI 49930 / US | 06 /
GESKE, Earl, A. 5181 N. Hillpoint Road Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US | 07 /
WEHR, Michael, A. 13318 Indian Road Kewadin, MI 49648 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02707625.6 | 30.01.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US02690 | Priority number, date | US20010265252P | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 265252 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02060662 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1384192 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/34 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/46 (EP,US);
G01N3/20 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0003 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0007 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0023 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0075 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0238 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02827 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0421 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | 30.07.2003 | LT | 30.07.2003 | LV | 30.07.2003 | MK | 30.07.2003 | RO | 30.07.2003 | SI | 30.07.2003 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON BEWERTUNGSTECHNIKEN AN EINEM STAMM ODER AN RUNDHOLZ | [2004/05] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AND METHOD OF PERFORMING EVALUATION TECHNIQUES ON A LOG OR ROUND TIMBER | [2004/05] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE TECHNIQUES D'EVALUATION SUR DE BILLES OU BOIS D'OEUVRE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2004 | 31.01.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1244699 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [X] 1-4,10-13,16,17,20,21,26,27,31,35 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0326284 (CZINNER ROBERT L) [X] 1-4,10,20,26 * the whole document * [A] 11-13,16,17,19,21,27,30; | [XA]US5024091 (PELLERIN ROY F [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * claims 1,3 *[A] 5-13,15-47; | [Y]US5060516 (LAU PETER W [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,9-13,16,17,19-21,24-27,30,43 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0036413 (CARTER HOLT HARVEY LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11-13,15-27,29-47 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 21 - page 20, line 24; figures 1,2,5,6; claims 1-7 * [Y] 1-4,9-13,16,17,19-21,24-27,30,43 | International search | [Y]US6026689 (SNYDER WILLIAM D [US], et al) |