blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1368102

EP1368102 - STUFFED TOY OR DOLL COMPRISING A COMPLEMENTARY ATTENTION-ATTRACTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pilou Company Ltd
Unit 9/Floor, Hop Hing Industrial Building, 704 Castle Peak Road Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2003/50]For all designated states
Pilou Company Ltd
Unit 9/Floor, Hop Hing Industrial Building, 704 Castle Peak Road
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / FONDIN, Gilles
27 route de Vannes
F-44100 NANTES / FR
02 / GUILLOT, Cyrille, No 1, Flat C, 1st Floor
Sea Horse Lane, Discovery Bay, Lantau Island
Hong Kong / CN
 [2003/50]
Representative(s)Catherine, Alain, et al
Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP
14-16, Rue Ballu
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/50]Catherine, Alain, et al
Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02708445.806.03.2002
[2003/50]
WO2002FR00810
Priority number, dateFR2001000300606.03.2001         Original published format: FR 0103006
[2003/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02070095
Date:12.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1368102
Date:10.12.2003
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:A63H3/00
[2003/50]
CPC:
A63H3/003 (EP,US); A63H3/006 (EP,US); A63H33/22 (EP,US);
A63H5/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PUPPEN- ODER STOFFTIERARTIGES SPIELZEUG MIT EINER ZUSÄTZLICHEN VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANREGEN DER AUFMERKSAMKEIT[2003/50]
English:STUFFED TOY OR DOLL COMPRISING A COMPLEMENTARY ATTENTION-ATTRACTING DEVICE[2003/50]
French:JOUET DU GENRE PELUCHE OU POUPEE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF COMPLEMENTAIRE D'EVEIL DE L'ATTENTION[2003/50]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2003National basic fee paid 
06.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/18]
09.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]US3734509  (GLASS M, et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 3,4,7;
 [Y]US5032099  (CHAN ALEX [HK]) [Y] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3014603  (RAMME HUBERTUS DIPL ING) [A] 1-4 * page 3, lines 7-24 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 16 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US4655726  (BRZEZINSKI RYSZARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [DA]FR2711543  (FONDIN GILLES [FR], et al) [DA] 1,5,6,8,9 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 30 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]US4742500  (LUCE NUNZIO A [US]) [DA] 1,6,10,11 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 4 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US6183338  (MALLETTE LORRETTA M [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, lines 20-65 * * figures 1-24 *
by applicantFR2711543
 US5114376
 US4742500
 US4828526
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.