Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1489121

EP1489121 - MODIFIER FOR POLYLACTIC ACID AND POLYLACTIC ACID COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE MODIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC.
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8520 / JP
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / IMAMURA, Shouji
2-15-13, Ohsakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0817 / JP
02 / ARIGA, Toshiro
1-39-5-B302, Higashi-abiko
Abiko-shi, Chiba 270-1144 / JP
03 / FURUTA, Hideyuki
4-5-1, Ohmiyadai, Wakaba-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 264-0015 / JP
04 / MIHARA, Takashi
1-27-1-B-308, Ohsakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0817 / JP
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date02708668.526.03.2002
[2004/52]
WO2002JP02915
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03080699
Date:02.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489121
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1489121
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.10.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/06, C08L67/04, C08G63/66, C08G81/00
[2005/30]
Former International [2004/52]C08G63/02, C08L67/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/42]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:MODIFIKATOR FÜR POLYMILCHSÄURE UND DEN MODIFIKATOR ENTHALTENDE POLYMILCHSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2004/52]
English:MODIFIER FOR POLYLACTIC ACID AND POLYLACTIC ACID COMPOSITION CONTAINING THE MODIFIER[2004/52]
French:MODIFICATEUR POUR L'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE ET COMPOSITION A BASE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE CONTENANT CE MODIFICATEUR[2004/52]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2004Translation filed 
23.09.2004National basic fee paid 
23.09.2004Search fee paid 
23.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
23.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
14.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2007Fee for grant paid
31.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5502158  (SINCLAIR RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 15 * * column 8, line 16 - line 35 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 39 * * column 11, line 64 - line 67 * * column 14, line 50 - line 64 * * column 17, line 16 - line 24 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US5202413  (SPINU MARIA [US]) [X] 1 * example 9 *;
 [X]US6211249  (COHN DANIEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-4 * examples 4,7,18 *;
 [A]US6303677  (WARZELHAN VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 47 * * column 7, line 7 - line 27 * * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 2; claim 4 *;
 [A]JPH08283557  ;
 [A]JPH1036651  ;
 [A]JPH08231838  ;
 [A]JPH10316846  ;
 [A]JPH08253665
 [X]  - GRIJPMA D W ET AL, "RUBBER TOUGHENING OF POLY(LACTIDE) BY BLENDING AND BLOCK COPOLYMERIZATION", POLYMER ENGINEERING & SCIENCE, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, (19941101), vol. 34, no. 22, ISSN 0032-3888, pages 1674 - 1684, XP000499000 [X] 1-8 * tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pen.760342205
 [X]  - LEFEBVRE H ET AL, "BIS(4-MONOSUBSTITUTED-5(4H)OXAZOLINONES) AS COUPLING AGENTS FOR BLOCK COPOLYMER SYNTHESIS: REACTION WITH HYDROXY-TERMINATED OLIGOMERS", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, WILEY-VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (199812), vol. 199, no. 12, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 2747 - 2753, XP000804377 [X] 1 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1998.021991218
 [X]  - FERRUTI P ET AL, "Synthesis and properties of novel block copolymers containing poly(lactic-glycolic acid) and poly(ethyleneglycol) segments", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199512), vol. 16, no. 18, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1423 - 1428, XP004032840 [X] 1-4 * table 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0142-9612(95)96879-5
 [X]  - HONG-BING TSAI ET AL, "BLOCK COPOLYETHERESTERS BLOCK COPOLYETHERESTERS WITH POLY(PENTAMETHYLENE P,P'-BIBENZOATE) SEGMENTS", POLYMER BULLETIN, SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, DE, (19951201), vol. 35, no. 6, ISSN 0170-0839, pages 743 - 749, XP000538858 [X] 1,2 * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00294958
 [X]  - LEFEVRE C ET AL, "Synthesis and thermal characterization of crystallizable poly(caprolactone)/poly(hexamethylene terephthalate) block copolymer", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (200110), vol. 42, no. 21, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 8769 - 8777, XP004297291 [X] 1 * table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(01)00362-7
 [X]  - OSAMU SANGEN, "A NEW SYNTHETIC PATHWAY OF SEGMENTED TRI-BLOCK COPOLYETHER", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, INTERSCIENCE POUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920501), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 1171 - 1175, XP000265263 [X] 1-4 * page 1173, column LEFT *
 [X]  - TIAN D ET AL, "MACROMOLECULAR ENGINEERING OF POLYLACTONES AND POLYACTIDES. 23. SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTEERIZATION OF BIODEGRADABLE AND BIOCOMPATIBLE HOMOPOLYMERS AND BLOCK COPOLYMERS BASED ON 1,4,S-TRIOXALÚ4.6SPIRO-9-U NDECANONE", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19970407), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 1947 - 1954, XP000684817 [X] 1 * tables 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma961614k
 [X]  - LOFGREN A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BIODEGRADABLE HOMOPOLYMERS AND BLOCK COPOLYMERS BASED ON 1,5-DIOXEPAN-2-ONE", MACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19940926), vol. 27, no. 20, ISSN 0024-9297, pages 5556 - 5562, XP000474815 [X] 1 * table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00098a007
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 02, Database accession no. 1997-017581, XP002330978 & JPH08283557 A 19961029 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 5-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 16, Database accession no. 1998-175120, XP002330979 & JPH1036651 A 19980210 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-461506, XP002330980 & JPH08231838 A 19960910 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 07, Database accession no. 1999-076602, XP002330981 & JPH10316846 A 19981202 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 49, Database accession no. 1996-493543, XP002330984 & JPH08253665 A 19961001 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
International search[A]EP0723983  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP])