Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1353617

EP1353617 - MINIMALLY INVASIVE GLAUCOMA SURGICAL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAERVELDT, George
11 Vista Sole
Monarch Beach, CA 92629 / US
02 / ROY, Chuck
30 Murasaki Street
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
 [2004/01]
Former [2003/43]01 / BAERVELDT, George
2162 Port Durness Place
Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US
02 / ROY, Chuck
34 Whitman Court
Irvine, CA 92697 / US
Representative(s)Maughan, Sophie Louise , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Ltd
45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Maughan, Sophie Louise , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2003/43]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date02709109.917.01.2002
[2003/43]
WO2002US01665
Priority number, dateUS20010263617P18.01.2001         Original published format: US 263617 P
[2003/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02056805
Date:25.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1353617
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002
[2003/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/007, A61F9/011, A61B18/00
[2003/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/43]
Extension statesAL18.08.2003
LT18.08.2003
LV18.08.2003
MK18.08.2003
RO18.08.2003
SI18.08.2003
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMALINVASIVEN BEHANDLUNG VON GLAUKOMA[2003/43]
English:MINIMALLY INVASIVE GLAUCOMA SURGICAL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD[2003/43]
French:INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL ET METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU GLAUCOME PEU INVASIFS[2003/43]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2003National basic fee paid 
18.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2006
20.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.11.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/32]
06.05.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/32]
Appeal following examination09.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0979/11
29.03.2011Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
19.02.2007Appeal received No.  T0952/07
18.04.2007Statement of grounds filed
06.09.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
06.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP10179648.0  / EP2335660
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2004
Request for further processing for:08.08.2005Request for further processing filed
08.08.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.08.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9951156  (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [X] 1-10,17-28,38,43,44,54,57-61 * figures 1,2,10 *;
 [X]US5123902  (MUELLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-16,18-28,38,44,54,58-61 * figures 3A,6A *;
 [XD]US4846172  (BERLIN MICHAEL S [US]) [XD] 1,3-10,17-28,38,43,44,54,57-61 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0067687  (GLAUTEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph L * * page 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]US5688261  (AMIRKHANIAN VAROUJ D [US], et al) [X] 1,19,54 * column 11, line 17 - line 18 * * column 13, paragraph 5 *;
 [X]US4559942  (EISENBERG WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1,11-14 * column 6, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]US5129895  (VASSILIADIS ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 11 * figures 2,5 *
by applicantUS4846172