Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1360287

EP1360287 - METHODS OF MODIFYING EUKARYOTIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
[2003/46]
Inventor(s)01 / MURPHY, Andrew, J.
10 Newton Court
Croton-On-Hudson, NY 10520 / US
02 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
03 / KAROW, Margaret
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
04 / MACDONALD, Lynn
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
05 / ECONOMIDES, Aris
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
06 / STEVENS, Sean
3954 Camino Calma
San Diego, CA 921222 / US
07 / VALENZUELA, David
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
 [2014/17]
Former [2014/16]01 / MURPHY, Andrew, J.
10 Newton Court
Croton-On-Hudson, NY 10520 / US
02 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
03 / KAROW, Margaret
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
04 / MACDONALD, Lynn
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
05 / ECONOMIDES, Aris
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
06 / STEVENS, Sean
335 Berry Street No. 413
San Francisco, CA 94158 / US
07 / VALENZUELA, David
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
Former [2014/15]01 / MURPHY, Andrew, J.
10 Newton Court
Croton-On-Hudson, NY 10520 / US
02 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
03 / KAROW, Margaret
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
04 / MACDONAL, Lynn
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
05 / ECONOMIDES, Aris
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
06 / STEVENS, Sean
335 Berry Street No. 413
San Francisco, CA 94158 / US
07 / VALENZUELA, David
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
Former [2003/46]01 / MURPHY, Andrew, J.
10 Newton Court
Croton-On-Hudson, NY 10520 / US
02 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/14]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2012/37]Bentham, Andrew , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2003/46]Bentham, Andrew , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date02709544.715.02.2002
[2003/46]
WO2002US04500
Priority number, dateUS2001078485916.02.2001         Original published format: US 784859
[2003/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02066630
Date:29.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1360287
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002
[2003/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1360287
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1360287
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.08.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/74
[2012/28]
Former International [2003/46]C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/74, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/06, C12N5/16, C12N5/08, C12P21/06, C12P21/04, C07H21/02, C07H21/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2019/14]
Former [2003/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIKATION EUKARYOTISCHER ZELLEN[2017/33]
English:METHODS OF MODIFYING EUKARYOTIC CELLS[2003/46]
French:PROCEDES DE MODIFICATION DE CELLULES EUCARYOTES[2003/46]
Former [2003/46]VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIKATION EUKARYONTISCHER ZELLEN
Entry into regional phase08.08.2003National basic fee paid 
08.08.2003Search fee paid 
08.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
08.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.08.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
13.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2011Observations by third parties
23.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2012Fee for grant paid
01.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10010741.6  / EP2264163
EP14163642.3  / EP2767588
EP14172420.3  / EP2787075
EP14172437.7  / EP2786657
EP16171559.4  / EP3085779
EP16171561.0  / EP3085780
EP19172361.8
EP19203913.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
 02  12.06.2013  07.01.2019  WITHDRAWN
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2019/07]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
 02  12.06.2013  07.01.2019  WITHDRAWN
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2017/08]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2016/29]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus N.V.
Padualaan 8, postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8
Postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8
Postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8
Postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 03  03.04.2014  07.04.2014  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John, et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
 02  12.06.2013  20.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8
Postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Opponent's representative
EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2013/29]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013   
Kymab Limited
Meditrina (B206)
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB
Opponent's representative
Stephen, Robert John
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
18.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.04.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2014
01.07.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
23.12.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.09.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.11.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.11.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition02.10.2017Appeal received No.  T1716/17
01.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
18.09.2014Appeal received No.  T2220/14
15.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
09.11.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1716/17
10.09.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
09.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]  - JESSEN J R ET AL, "Modification of bacterial artificial chromosomes through chi-stimulated homologous recombination and its application in zebrafish transgenesis.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 28 APR 1998, (19980428), vol. 95, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5121 - 5126, XP002268041 [X] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.9.5121
International search[X]WO9402602  (CELL GENESYS INC [US]);
 [Y]  - YANG X.W. ET AL., "Homologous recombination based modification in escherichia coli and germline transmission in transgenic mice of a bacterial artificial chromosome", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199709), vol. 15, pages 859 - 865, XP002081201

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0997-859
 [Y]  - LIE Y.S. ET AL., "Advances in quantitative PCR technology: 5' nuclease assays", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 9, pages 43 - 48, XP002909587

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(98)80082-7
by applicantWO9402602
    - JOYNER, THE PRACTICAL APPROACH SERIES, (1999), vol. 293
    - JESSEN ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 5121 - 5126
    - YANG ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, pages 859 - 865
    - LIE ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 9, pages 43 - 48
    - BRUGGEMANN, ARCHIVUM IMMUNOLOGIAE ET THERAPIAE EXPERIMENTALIS, (2001), vol. 49, pages 203 - 208
    - BRUGGEMANN; TAUSSIG, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (1997), vol. 8, pages 455 - 458
    - DENG; CAPECCHI, MOL CELL BIOL, (1992), vol. 12, pages 3365 - 71
    - ZHANG ET AL., NAT GENET, (1998), vol. 20, pages 123 - 8
    - YANG ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 859 - 65
    - ANGRAND ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1999), vol. 27, page E16
    - MUYRERS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1999), vol. 27, pages 1555 - 7
    - NARAYANAN ET AL., GENE THER, (1999), vol. 6, pages 442 - 7
    - JOYNER, THE PRACTICAL APPROACH SERIES, (1999), page 293
    - HILL ET AL., GENOMICS, (2000), vol. 64, pages 111 - 3