Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1381986

EP1381986 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPICTING ON-LINE TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PayPal, Inc.
1840 Embarcadero Road East
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]For all designated states
Paypal, Inc.
1840 Embarcadero Road East
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEVCHIN, Max
469 Grant Avenue Q
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / FREZZA, Robert
deceased / US
 [2004/04]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Davies, Simon Robert
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London, EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date02709643.719.02.2002
[2004/04]
WO2002US05317
Priority number, dateUS2001079384326.02.2001         Original published format: US 793843
[2004/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02069092
Date:06.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1381986
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002
[2004/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.10.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2004/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABBILDEN VON ONLINE-TRANSAKTIONEN[2004/04]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPICTING ON-LINE TRANSACTIONS[2004/04]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ILLUSTRATION DE TRANSACTIONS EN LIGNE[2004/04]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2003National basic fee paid 
16.09.2003Search fee paid 
16.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/04]
05.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2011Invitation to provide information on prior art
17.08.2011Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
09.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.09.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.11.2014Appeal received No.  T0279/15
23.01.2015Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
International search[AE]US2002072993  ;
 [XP]US2001010730  ;
 [AP]US2001037316  ;
 [X]US5963922  ;
 [A]JPS55110367