Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1351981

EP1351981 - A VIRUS CAUSING RESPIRATORY TRACT ILLNESS IN SUSCEPTIBLE MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein 50
3015 GE Rotterdam / NL
[2016/21]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Vironovative B.V.
Marconistraat 16
3029 AK Rotterdam / NL
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Vironovative B.V.
Burgemeester Oudlaan 50
3062 PA Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE JONG, Jan, Cornelius
Krugerlaan 205
NL-2806 EH Gouda / NL
02 / FOUCHIER, Ronaldus, Adrianus, Maria
Essenburgsingel 44a
NL-3021 AR Rotterdam / NL
03 / VAN DEN HOOGEN, Bernadetta, Gerarda
Essenburgsingel 44a
NL-3021 AR Rotterdam / NL
04 / OSTERHAUS, Albertus, D. M. E.
Dr. Breveestraat 16
NL-3981 CH Bunnik / NL
05 / GROEN, Jan
14 Sea Bridge Road
Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US
 [2004/03]
Former [2003/42]01 / DE JONG, Jan, Cornelius
Krugerlaan 205
NL-2806 EH Gouda / NL
02 / FOUCHIER, Ronaldus, Adrianus, Maria
Essenburgsingel 44a
NL-3021 AR Rotterdam / NL
03 / VAN DEN HOOGEN, Bernadetta, Gerarda
Essenburgsingel 44a
NL-3021 AR Rotterdam / NL
04 / OSTERHAUS, Albertus, D. M. E.
Dr. Breveestraat 16
NL-3981 CH Bunnik / NL
05 / GROEN, Jan
Anholtkade 2
NL-3446 BM Woerden / NL
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/34]Habets, Winand
Life Science Patents PO Box 5096
6130 PB Sittard / NL
Former [2012/32]Chapman, Paul Gilmour , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
Former [2006/43]Chapman, Paul Gilmour , et al
Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE
Scotland / GB
Former [2003/42]Hughes, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date02710551.918.01.2002
[2003/42]
WO2002NL00040
Priority number, dateEP2001020021319.01.2001         Original published format: EP 01200213
EP2001020398518.10.2001         Original published format: EP 01203985
[2003/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02057302
Date:25.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1351981
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002
[2003/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1351981
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/135
[2003/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/42]
TitleGerman:EIN ERKRANKUNGEN DER ATEMWEGE VERURSACHENDES VIRUS IN SÄUGERN[2003/42]
English:A VIRUS CAUSING RESPIRATORY TRACT ILLNESS IN SUSCEPTIBLE MAMMALS[2003/42]
French:VIRUS PROVOQUANT DES MALADIES RESPIRATOIRES CHEZ DES MAMMIFERES Y ETANT SENSIBLES[2003/42]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase07.08.2003National basic fee paid 
07.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
14.10.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2012Fee for grant paid
07.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2014Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.05.2013  15.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Behrens, Lüder
Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kuttenkeuler, David, et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [2020/02]
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  07.05.2013  15.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Behrens, Lüder
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrens, Lüder, et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2013/48]
Opponent(s)01  07.05.2013  15.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Behrens, Lüder
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrens, Lüder, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2013/24]
Opponent(s)01  07.05.2013   
Dr. Martin Huenges/, Dr. Lüder Behrens
C/O Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenstrasse 3 , Elisenhof
80335 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrens, Lüder, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
12.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition14.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1805/15
19.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
12.04.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/16]
18.08.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/34]
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
PT10.12.2012
IE18.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
LU18.01.2014
[2015/32]
Former [2014/41]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
PT10.12.2012
IE18.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
LU18.01.2014
Former [2014/07]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
PT10.12.2012
IE18.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
PT10.12.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/13]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
GR09.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0020600  (HUGGINS MICHAEL BRIAN ;DAVIS PHIL (GB); TARPEY IAN (GB); COOK JANE) [X] 1-47 * the whole document *;
 [PX]FR2801607  (MERIAL SAS) [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  - "Nucleoprotein", EBI, SWALL, (20011201), Database accession no. Q91F57, XP002213817 [PX] 1-47 * abstract *
 [X]  - "Nucleocapsid protein", EBI, SWALL, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9QF48, XP002213818 [X] 1-47 * abstract *
 [PX]  - "Phosphoprotein", EBI, SWALL, (20011201), Database accession no. Q91KZ5, XP002213819 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Phosphoprotein", EBI, SWALL, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9QF47, XP002213820 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - "Matrix protein", EBI, SWALL, (20011201), Database accession no. Q91F56, XP002213821 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Matrix protein", EBI, SWALL, (19981101), Database accession no. O90244, XP002213822 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - "Fusion protein", EBI, SWALL, (20011201), Database accession no. Q91F55, XP002213823 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "Fusion protein", EBI, SWALL, (20000501), Database accession no. Q9QDI1, XP002213824 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - "RNA-dependent RNA polymerase", EBI, SWALL, (20011201), Database accession no. Q91L20, XP002213825 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "RNA-dependent RNA polymerase", EBI, SWALL, (19970501), Database accession no. P87509, XP002213826 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BAYON-AUBOYER M H ET AL, "Comparison of F-, G- and N-based RT-PCR protocols with conventional virological procedures for the detection and typing of turkey rhinotracheitis virus.", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 144, no. 6, ISSN 0304-8608, pages 1091 - 1109, XP002213815 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s007050050572
 [X]  - BAYON-AUBOYER MARIE-HELENE ET AL, "Nucleotide sequences of the F, L and G protein genes of two non-A/non-B avian pneumoviruses (APV) reveal a novel APV subgroup", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, GB, (200011), vol. 81, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2723 - 2733, XP002176553 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - RANDHAWA J S ET AL, "Rescue of synthetic minireplicons establishes the absence of the NS1 and NS2 genes from avian pneumovirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19971201), vol. 71, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 9849 - 9854, XP002083386 [X] 1-6,8,10-14 * abstract * [Y] 7,9,15-47
 [Y]  - AHMADIAN G ET AL, "Detection and characterization of proteins encoded by the second ORF of the M2 gene of pneumoviruses", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, GB, (199908), vol. 80, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2011 - 2016, XP002176552 [Y] 1-47 * abstract *
 [Y]  - YU Q ET AL, "Deduced amino acid sequence of the fusion glycoprotein of turkey rhinotracheitis virus has greater identity with that of human respiratory syncytial virus, a pneomovirus, than that of paramyxoviruses and morbilliviruses", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, READING, BERKS, GB, (1991), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 75 - 81, XP002095554 [Y] 1-47 * abstract *
 [A]  - PRINGLE C R, "Virus Taxonomy at the XIth International Congress of Virology, Sydney, Australia, August 9-13, 1999.", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 144, no. 10, ISSN 0304-8608, pages 2065 - 2070, XP002213816

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s007050050728
 [T]  - HOOGEN VAN DEN BERNADETTE G ET AL, "A newly discovered human pneumovirus isolated from young children with respiratory tract disease", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (200106), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 719 - 724, XP002176554

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/89098
otherWO02057302
    - VAN DEN HOOGEN; ET AL, "A NEWLY DISCOVERED HUMAN PNEUMOVIRUS ISOLATED FROM YOUNG CHILDREN WITH RESPIRATORY TRACT DISEASE", NATURE MEDICINE, (20010601), vol. 7, pages 719 - 724, XP002176554

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/89098
    - HYUN-JIN SHIN; ET AL, "AVIAN PNEUMOVIRUS (APV) RNA FROM WILD AND SENTINEL BIRDS IN THE UNITED STATES HAS GENETIC HOMOLOGY WITH RNA FROM APV ISOLATES FROM DOMESTIC TURKEYS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 38, no. 11, (20001101), pages 4282 - 4284, URL: HTTP://JCM.ASM.ORG/CONTENT/38/11/4282.ABSTRACT, XP055183041
    - "HYBRIDIZATION OF RADIOLABELED PROBES TO IMMOBILIZED NUCLEIC ACIDS", SAMBROOK ET AL, MOLECULAR CLONING. LABORATORY MANUAL,2ND EDITION, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 2, pages 9.47 - 9.55, XP002162309