Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1362099

EP1362099 - METHOD OF PROVIDING POLYPEPTIDE PREPARATIONS WITH REDUCED ENZYMATIC SIDE ACTIVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2017Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chr. Hansen A/S
Bøge Allé 10-12
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2013/20]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Chr. Hansen A/S
Boege Allé 10-12
2970 Hoersholm / DK
Inventor(s)01 / HARBOE, Marianne, Kirsten
Kulsviervej 149
DK-2900 Lyngby / DK
 [2003/47]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02710764.806.02.2002
[2003/47]
WO2002DK00083
Priority number, dateUS2001077956009.02.2001         Original published format: US 779560
[2003/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02064759
Date:22.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1362099
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002
[2003/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1362099
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/99
[2003/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYPEPTZUBEREITUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTER ENZYMATISCHER NEBENWIRKUNGEN[2003/47]
English:METHOD OF PROVIDING POLYPEPTIDE PREPARATIONS WITH REDUCED ENZYMATIC SIDE ACTIVITIES[2003/47]
French:TECHNIQUE DE PREPARATIONS DE POLYPEPTIDE A ACTIVITES SECONDAIRES ENZYMATIQUES REDUITES[2003/47]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2003National basic fee paid 
09.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2009Fee for grant paid
20.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [2015/34]
Former [2014/23]
Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  19.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
DuPont Nutrition BioSciences ApS
Langebrogade 1
P.O. Box 17
1001 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
21.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
14.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.09.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition12.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0313/16
13.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0313/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CY15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
TR15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
GB06.02.2014
IE06.02.2014
LU06.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/31]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
CY15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
GB06.02.2014
IE06.02.2014
LU06.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/09]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
GB06.02.2014
IE06.02.2014
LU06.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
IE06.02.2014
LU06.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
LU06.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
MC15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
LU06.02.2014
Former [2014/06]AT15.05.2013
BE15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT15.05.2013
SE15.05.2013
GR16.08.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT15.05.2013
ES26.08.2013
PT16.09.2013
Former [2013/47]PT16.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9720921  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 8, line 7 - line 8; claims 1-8,13 * * page 15; example 6 *;
 [X]US2683682  (MILLER BYRON S, et al) [X] 1-34 * column 1, line 26 - line 37 * * column 1, line 41 - line 44 * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 1 *;
 [A]US3950221  (KOKUSHO YOSHITAKA, et al) [A] 1-34 * column 2, line 36 - line 50 * * abstract *;
 [A]US6103508  (KATO MAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * column 2, line 16 - line 19 * * abstract *
by applicantWO9015866
 WO9529999
 WO9720921
 US2683682