Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1360632

EP1360632 - SYSTEM FOR MANAGING MEDICAL INSURANCE USING INFORMATION COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seo-O Telecom Co., Ltd.
60-16, Seokchon-Dong Songpa-Gu
Seoul 138-190 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
Seo-O Telecom Co., Ltd.
60-16, Seokchon-Dong
Songpa-Gu, Seoul 138-190 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Seong-Soo
108-207, Semteo Maeul Apt., 718, Ilwonbon-Dong
Gangnam-Gu, Seoul 135-942 / KR
02 / KANG, Byung-Gu
907-1405, Gayang Apt., 1490, Gayang-Dong
Gangseo-Gu, Seoul 157-200 / KR
 [2003/46]
Representative(s)2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft mbB
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Application number, filing date02711506.201.02.2002
[2003/46]
WO2002KR00151
Priority number, dateKR2001000503902.02.2001         Original published format: KR 2001005039
KR2001002458407.05.2001         Original published format: KR 2001024584
[2003/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02075627
Date:26.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1360632
Date:12.11.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002
[2003/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.09.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2003/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG DER MEDIZINISCHEN VERSICHERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKS[2003/46]
English:SYSTEM FOR MANAGING MEDICAL INSURANCE USING INFORMATION COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2003/46]
French:SYSTEME DE GESTION D'ASSURANCE MALADIE FAISANT APPEL A UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS[2003/46]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2003National basic fee paid 
02.09.2003Search fee paid 
02.09.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
30.07.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
01.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
14.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1079770  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-14 * abstract *;
 US6272470  [ ] (TESHIMA FUMIAKI [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * column 6, line 43 - column 8, line 50 *;
 [X]US5974124  (SCHLUETER JR EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 41 *;
 [X]US5867821  (BALLANTYNE DOUGLAS J [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 10, line 28 - column 12, line 8 *;
 [X]US6157914  (SETO HIROMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 6; figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 22 *;
 [X]US5899998  (MCGAULEY JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 32 * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 37 *;
 [X]US5291399  (CHACO JOHN [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 61 - column 8, line 18 *
International search[X]KR20000054731  (JO IN HO [KR]);
 [Y]KR20000017728  (APLUS ELECTRONIC INC);
 [Y]US4858121  (BARBER WILLIAM B [US], et al);
 [Y]US4491725  (PRITCHARD LAWRENCE E [US]);
 [A]US5704044  (TARTER FRED B [US], et al);
 [A]US5930759  (MOORE JAMES G [US], et al)