Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1354305

EP1354305 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rodgers, Stephen Frederick
No. 9 Caister Drive, Mulbarton Johannesburg 2059
Gauteng Province / ZA
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
Rodgers, Stephen Frederick
No. 9 Caister Drive, Mulbarton
Johannesburg 2059, Gauteng Province / ZA
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/43]
Representative(s)Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]Parnham, Kevin
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date02712124.317.01.2002
[2003/43]
WO2002IB00109
Priority number, dateZA2001000046917.01.2001         Original published format: ZA 200100469
ZA2001001004706.12.2001         Original published format: ZA 200110047
[2003/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02058021
Date:25.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1354305
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002
[2003/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G08B25/08
[2003/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2003/43]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2003/43]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2003/43]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2003National basic fee paid 
16.08.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.08.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
16.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
30.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6147601  (SANDELMAN DAVID ET AL) [X] 1-16,18,19,22-34,36,37,40-43 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 8, line 35 *;
 [XA]WO9816412  (TELIA AB) [X] 1,13,16,17,25,33-35,44 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 18 * [A] 20,21,38,39