Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1253964

EP1253964 - TENSION ADAPTER FOR A CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pajunk, Heinrich
Am Holzplatz 5 - 7
78187 Geisingen / DE
For all designated states
Pajunk, Horst
Am Holzplatz 5 - 7
78187 Geisingen / DE
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2002/45]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date02712803.205.01.2002
[2002/45]
WO2002EP00048
Priority number, dateDE200110097511.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10100975
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02062417
Date:15.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1253964
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1253964
Date:30.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/12
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPANNADAPTER FÜR EINEN KATHETER[2002/45]
English:TENSION ADAPTER FOR A CATHETER[2002/45]
French:ADAPTATEUR DE CONTRAINTE POUR CATHETER[2002/45]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2002National basic fee paid 
29.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
26.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2006Fee for grant paid
12.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.08.2006
IE30.08.2006
LU05.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
PT12.02.2007
[2009/38]
Former [2008/04]IE30.08.2006
MC31.01.2007
PT12.02.2007
Former [2007/48]IE30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
MC31.01.2007
PT12.02.2007
Former [2007/38]IE30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
PT12.02.2007
Former [2007/27]IE30.08.2006
PT12.02.2007
Former [2007/25]IE30.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2331339  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [YA]DE2914034  (MEDTRONIC INC) [Y] 1 * page 14, line 4 - line 11 * * figure - * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0596344  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 32 - line 33 * * column 4, line 44 - line 51 * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0482196  (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *