Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1397406

EP1397406 - ADHESIVE FILLED WITH SURFACE-TREATED CHALK AND SOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Technology AG
Zugerstrasse 50
6340 Baar / CH
[2009/04]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Sika Schweiz AG
Tüffenwies 16-22
8064 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PFENNINGER, Ueli
Alte Landstrasse 30
CH-8804 Au / CH
02 / STADELMANN, Ursula
Schürliweg 8
CH-8046 Zürich / CH
03 / KÜLLING, Annemarie
Chilewiese 2
8197 Rafz / CH
 [2008/49]
Former [2004/12]01 / PFENNINGER, Ueli
Alte Landstrasse 30
CH-8804 Au / CH
02 / STADELMANN, Ursula
Schürliweg 8
CH-8046 Zürich / CH
03 / KÜLLING, Annemarie
Ruchwiesenstrasse 53
CH-8404 Winterthur / CH
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]Sika Patent Attorneys
C/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16 Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
Former [2004/12]Isler, Jörg
c/o Sika Technology AG, Corp. Intellectual Property Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date02720361.118.04.2002
[2004/12]
WO2002IB01247
Priority number, dateEP2001011115810.05.2001         Original published format: EP 01111158
[2004/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02090411
Date:14.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1397406
Date:17.03.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002
[2004/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1397406
Date:31.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/10, C09J175/04, C08K3/04, C08K3/26
[2004/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFF, GEFÜLLT MIT OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTER KREIDE UND RUSS[2004/12]
English:ADHESIVE FILLED WITH SURFACE-TREATED CHALK AND SOOT[2004/12]
French:ADHESIF CHARGE EN CRAIES ET EN SUIES TRAITEES EN SURFACE[2004/12]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2003National basic fee paid 
10.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/12]
31.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2008Fee for grant paid
28.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.2010  10.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2011/07]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.02.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.06.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.11.2013Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.11.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/15]
22.02.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0215/14
04.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
22.11.2018Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
GR31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
AT18.04.2010
LU18.04.2010
BE30.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
[2014/38]
Former [2011/16]CY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
BE30.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/14]CY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/10]CY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/08]CY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/07]CY31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IE31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/50]CY31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
MC30.04.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/47]CY31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/46]FI31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
Former [2010/45]FI31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
Former [2010/38]FI31.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE19923300  (BAYER AG) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 39; example 3 *;
 [Y]JP2000351894  ;
 [A]US5756751  (LIMBECK GOETZ ET AL) [A] 1-10 * example 39 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 29 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 10 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000351894 A 20001219 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *