blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1391288 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1391288



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1744
25.10.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
17.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 26
06.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.03.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
26.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
26.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
19.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.02.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
06.02.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.02.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 4
06.02.2016 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
05.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
04.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
02.02.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
01.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
01.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 19
07.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
23.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
23.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 1
18.12.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.06.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
24.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 7
17.06.2013 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
06.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
23.10.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 15
22.06.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.02.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
03.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.11.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
18.11.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.11.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.08.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.07.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
07.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
16.05.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.05.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.03.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.03.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.03.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
25.02.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
25.02.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
25.02.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 18
23.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
20.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
19.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
19.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
29.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.06.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
21.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.05.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.05.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 4
14.04.2010 Claims Opposition 4
14.04.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
13.04.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 42
13.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.04.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
12.04.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
04.12.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
04.12.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.12.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.04.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
22.12.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.12.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 60
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
17.01.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
08.01.2008 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
08.01.2008 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
21.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.12.2007 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
21.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
21.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 87
24.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
24.10.2007 Description Search / examination 1
24.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Annex Search / examination 12
20.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
20.09.2007 Description Search / examination 40
20.09.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
10.05.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.05.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.10.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.05.2005 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 1
11.11.2004 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.10.2004 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.10.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2004 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 2
08.10.2004 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
19.07.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
09.07.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
01.06.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Partial European search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
14.01.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
09.12.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.09.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
02.01.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
07.11.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 10
07.11.2002 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 13
07.11.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 50
06.11.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 7
23.09.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 8
23.09.2002 Description Search / examination 82
23.09.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5