Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1385810

EP1385810 - PROCESS FOR EXTRACTING PHENOL BY OPTIMIZATION OF ALKALI USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2011/38]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
Sunoco Inc., (R & M)
Ten Penn Center, 1801 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Sunoco Inc., (R & M)
Ten Penn Center, 1801 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EMBLIGE, Robert, W.
136 East Bristol Road
Ivyland, PA 18974-2312 / US
 [2005/05]
Former [2004/06]01 / EMBLIGE, Robert, W.
109 Yale Avenue
Swarthmore, PA 19801 / US
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/38]Stewart, Lucy Caroline
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2004/06]Hertz, Oliver, Dr.
v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date02723625.626.03.2002
[2004/06]
WO2002US09347
Priority number, dateUS2001085062507.05.2001         Original published format: US 850625
[2004/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02090303
Date:14.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1385810
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1385810
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C37/72, C07C39/04
[2004/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON PHENOL DURCH OPTIMISIERUNG DER VERWENDUNG VON ALKALI[2004/06]
English:PROCESS FOR EXTRACTING PHENOL BY OPTIMIZATION OF ALKALI USAGE[2004/06]
French:PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION DE PHENOL PAR OPTIMISATION DE L'UTILISATION DE L'ALCALI[2004/06]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2003National basic fee paid 
15.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
25.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2010Fee for grant paid
13.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.05.2011  04.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Phenol GmbH
Dechenstrasse 3
45966 Gladbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent, et al
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/23]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2011  04.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Phenol GmbH
Dechenstrasse 3
45966 Gladbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
polypatent BGL, et al
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2011/27]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2011   
Ineos Phenol GmbH
Dechenstrasse 3
45966 Gladbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Polypatent, et al
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
07.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.01.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.08.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.08.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.07.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2019
24.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
01.10.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
06.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
Appeal following opposition08.10.2013Appeal received No.  T2117/13
17.12.2013Statement of grounds filed
25.10.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
25.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
DK01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
TR01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
PT03.01.2011
GB26.03.2011
IE26.03.2011
LU26.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2011/24]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
PT03.01.2011
Former [2011/15]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
GR02.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT01.09.2010
CY01.09.2010
Former [2011/08]AT01.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4973766  (PENZO RENZO [IT], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS3277185
 US4973766
 US4262151
 EP0717024
 US4312636
 US5487816
 US3899294
 US3673070
 US4859608
 CZ278858
 JPH02270830
    - WASSER, LUFT UND BETRIEB, (1969), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 178 - 180
    - CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 9, pages 20 - 23
    - THE CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGENEERING, (1993), vol. 71, pages 256 - 263
    - KOKS KHIM, (1992), vol. 8, pages 25 - 27
    - REV CHIM (BUCHAREST), (1990), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 691 - 695
    - J CHEM SOC FARADAY TRANS I, (1981), vol. 71, pages 575 - 589
by applicantUS3277185
 US4973766
 US5487816
    - WURM; CHRISTOF, WASSER, LUFT UND BETRIEB, (1969), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 178 - 180