Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1385810 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1385810



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1153
02.01.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Amended description with annotations Opposition 11
18.12.2019 Description Opposition 11
18.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.12.2019 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
23.10.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
23.10.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.10.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.10.2019 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 25
01.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Opposition 11
01.10.2019 Description Opposition 11
01.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.10.2019 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.07.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.07.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.07.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.06.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.06.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.06.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
05.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.06.2019 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
27.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.05.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
21.05.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.05.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
27.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
02.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
02.11.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
28.09.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
28.09.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.09.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
29.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.08.2018 Claims Appeal 12
24.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
11.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.10.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
29.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
22.09.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.09.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.09.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.09.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
13.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
08.09.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
05.09.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
08.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.07.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
20.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.09.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
11.11.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
03.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
18.06.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.04.2014 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
07.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2014 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
19.03.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
20.12.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
17.12.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
17.12.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.12.2013 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
16.12.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
14.10.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.10.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.10.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
12.08.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
12.08.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.08.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.07.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
24.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
03.05.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 17
17.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 18
14.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
10.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.08.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
19.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.08.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 8
12.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.08.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 2
07.07.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.07.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
09.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
31.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
31.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
31.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
31.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
31.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
30.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
30.05.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
05.08.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.07.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.07.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
13.07.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.04.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.04.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
30.04.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
13.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
13.01.2010 Description Search / examination 7
13.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.11.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
20.10.2008 Description Search / examination 6
20.10.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
21.08.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.05.2007 Drawings Search / examination 19
23.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.02.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.02.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.01.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.01.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
14.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
11.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
08.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
24.03.2004 Priority document Search / examination 42
24.03.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Drawings Search / examination 6
07.01.2004 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.12.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.12.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.12.2003 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
12.12.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.10.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
22.10.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
15.10.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.09.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.04.2003 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
14.11.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
01.05.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
01.05.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 8
01.05.2002 Description International Searching Authority 19
01.05.2002 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1