Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1351626

EP1351626 - DETACHABLE SELF-EXPANDING ANEURYSM COVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2009
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.
14000 N.W. 57th Court Miami Lakes
Florida 33014 / US
[2008/09]
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.
14000 N.W. 57th Court
Miami Lakes, Florida 33014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Donald, K.
4945 NW 82nd Terrace
Lauderhill, FL 33351 / US
02 / MITELBERG, Vladimir
3350 NE 192 Street, Apartment No. 2-J
Aventura, FL 33180 / US
 [2003/42]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/42]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date02724974.716.01.2002
[2003/42]
WO2002US04981
Priority number, dateUS20010261909P16.01.2001         Original published format: US 261909 P
[2003/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02054980
Date:18.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1351626
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002
[2003/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1351626
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.11.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/90
[2007/22]
Former International [2003/42]A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/42]
TitleGerman:ENTFERNBARE, SELBSTEXPANDIERENDE ANEURYSMA-ABDECKUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2003/42]
English:DETACHABLE SELF-EXPANDING ANEURYSM COVER DEVICE[2003/42]
French:DISPOSITIF AUTO-EXPANSIBLE AMOVIBLE DE RECOUVREMENT D'UN ANEVRISME[2003/42]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2003National basic fee paid 
16.07.2003Search fee paid 
16.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/42]
09.10.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
20.11.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
06.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2007Fee for grant paid
21.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
ES07.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
[2011/43]
Former [2010/47]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
ES07.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/33]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
ES07.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
ES07.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/46]AT27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
ES07.06.2008
Former [2008/39]AT27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
ES07.06.2008
Former [2008/35]ES07.06.2008
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5800520  (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [A]US5514176  (BOSLEY JR RODNEY W [US])
by applicantUS5108407
 US5122136
 US4512338
 US5551954
 US4994071
 US5772668
 US6254612
 US6267783