EP1383529 - METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS OF THE EYE AND SURROUNDING TISSUE WITH THYMOSIN 4 (T 4), ANALOGUES, ISOFORMS AND OTHER DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regenerx, Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 3 Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 700 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Regenerx, Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 3 Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 700 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDSTEIN, Allan, L. 800 25th Street, N.W., Apt. 1005 Washington, DC 20037 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725151.1 | 14.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US07730 | Priority number, date | US20010275645P | 15.03.2001 Original published format: US 275645 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02074193 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383529 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/08, A61K38/22, A61K38/18, A61K39/395, A61P27/02 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/2292 (EP,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | A61K38/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DER AUGEN UND UMLIEGENDEN GEWEBE MIT THYMOSIN 4 (T 4), ANALOGA, ISOFORMEN UND ANDEREN DERIVATIVEN | [2004/05] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS OF THE EYE AND SURROUNDING TISSUE WITH THYMOSIN 4 (T 4), ANALOGUES, ISOFORMS AND OTHER DERIVATIVES | [2004/05] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES DE L'OEIL ET DES TISSUS AUTOURS DE L'OEIL AU MOYEN DE LA THYMOSINE BETA 4 (TB4), D'ANALOGUES, D'ISOFORMES ET D'AUTRES DERIVATIFS | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9949883 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB], et al) [XD] 1-7,14-17 * page 3, line 23 - line 25 * * page 6, line 16 - line 19 * * page 6, line 24 *; | [E]US2003060405 (KLEINMAN HYNDA K [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; claims 1-3,23,38-44 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 4, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 6, column R, paragraph 1 *; | [E]US2004220111 (KLEINMAN HYNDA K [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; example 4 * * page 4, column L, paragraph 4 ** page 6, column R, paragraph 1 * | International search | [X]US4444757 (STRAUSSER HELEN R [US]); | [X]US5652209 (PFLUGFELDER STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [X]WO0006190 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [X]US6124259 (DELMAGE MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US6146630 (TSUBOTA KAZUO [JP], et al) |