Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1381633

EP1381633 - SYNTHESIS OF VINYL POLYMERS BY CONTROLLED RADICAL POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2010Correction of patent specificationpublished on 31.03.2010  [2010/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
[2004/04]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITE, Daniela
494 Woodland Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US
02 / O'DWYER, James B.
117 Spring Valley Road
Valencia, PA 16059 / US
 [2004/04]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner
Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date02725748.423.04.2002
[2004/04]
WO2002US12566
Priority number, dateUS20010286142P24.04.2001         Original published format: US 286142 P
US2002011623904.04.2002         Original published format: US 116239
[2004/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02085957
Date:31.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1381633
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002
[2004/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1381633
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1381633
Date:17.02.2010
[2010/07]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1381633
Date:31.03.2010
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/38, C08F293/00, C08F297/00
[2004/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2008/34]
Former [2004/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYNTHESE VON VINYLPOLYMEREN DURCH KONTROLLIERTE RADIKALPOLYMERISATION[2008/33]
English:SYNTHESIS OF VINYL POLYMERS BY CONTROLLED RADICAL POLYMERIZATION[2004/04]
French:SYNTHESE DE POLYMERES VINYLIQUES PAR POLYMERISATION RADICALAIRE CONTROLEE[2004/04]
Former [2004/04]SYNTHESE VON VINYLPOLYMEREN DURCH KONTROLLIERTE RADIKALPOLYMERIZATION
Entry into regional phase04.11.2003National basic fee paid 
04.11.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/04]
04.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2008Fee for grant paid
27.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPH04213307  ;
 [A]JPS61233023  ;
 [A]FR2653433  (NORSOLOR SA [FR]) [A] 1-74 * page 11, lines 1-6 * * page 14, line 17 - line 19; claim - *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921126), vol. 016, no. 556, Database accession no. (C - 1007), [X] 9-16 * abstract * [A] 1-8,17-74
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870306), vol. 011, no. 075, Database accession no. (C - 408), [A] 1-74 * abstract *