Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1367681

EP1367681 - VACUUM SWITCH UNIT AND SWITCH GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKAZAWA, Hiroshi, Mitsubishi Denki KK
7-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SANO, Kouji, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
7-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / UENUSHI, Masashi, Mitsubishi Denki KK
7-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / TSURIMOTO, Takao, Mitsubishi Denki KK
7-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2007/16]
Former [2003/49]01 / OKAZAWA, Hiroshi, Mitsubishi Denki KK
2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / SANO, Kouji, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / UENUSHI, Masashi, Mitsubishi Denki KK
2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / TSURIMOTO, Takao, Mitsubishi Denki KK
2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02726482.924.05.2002
[2003/49]
WO2002JP05037
Priority number, dateJP2001022030419.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001220304
JP2001022030319.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001220303
JP2001022030219.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001220302
JP2001022523026.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001225230
[2003/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03009441
Date:30.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1367681
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1367681
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H02B1/20, H02B11/04, H01H33/66
[2003/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2006/50]
Former [2003/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VAKUUMSCHALTEREINHEIT UND SCHALTVORRICHTUNG[2003/49]
English:VACUUM SWITCH UNIT AND SWITCH GEAR[2003/49]
French:UNITE DE COMMUTATION SOUS VIDE ET APPAREILLAGE DE COMMUTATION[2003/49]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2003Translation filed 
25.06.2003National basic fee paid 
25.06.2003Search fee paid 
25.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
30.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2007Fee for grant paid
08.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.01.2008  08.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2008  08.02.2008  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2008/10]
Opponent(s)01  17.01.2008   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft, Berlin und München
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
04.03.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.06.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
29.01.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0707/15
28.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3527911  (SHARP WILLIAM T) [X] 1,3,4 * page 3, column 46 - page 8, column 26; figure 4 * [A] 2,5-10;
 [A]DE3447314  (CALOR EMAG ELEKTRIZITAETS AG) [A] 1-4 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1,3,8 *
International search[X]JPS4531709Y  ;
 [X]JPH1198267  ;
 [Y]JPH06231660  ;
 [Y]JPH07193921  ;
 [Y]JPH11146514